Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/08/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/14/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/14/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/14/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/06/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/27/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/27/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/17/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/17/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/18/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/17/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/20/2014