Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/27/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/10/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/31/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/17/2014