Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/03/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/11/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/11/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/11/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/16/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/22/2014