Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/11/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/15/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/15/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/15/2014