Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/20/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/13/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/15/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/03/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/11/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/11/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/11/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/11/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/15/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/15/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/15/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/15/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/15/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/15/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/16/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/16/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/22/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/01/2014