Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/09/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/09/2014