There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Call Center Worker and Consumer Protection Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Labor to maintain a publicly available list of all employers that relocate a call center overseas, to make such companies ineligible for Federal grants or guaranteed loans, and to require disclosure of the physical location of business agents engaging in customer service communications, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/01/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
09/13/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
08/02/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/01/2013 Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/2013 Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/2013 Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/2013 Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/2013 Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 10/29/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/29/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/29/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/29/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 10/29/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/29/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/06/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/16/2014

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce08/01/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade08/02/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services08/01/2013 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform08/01/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce08/01/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections09/13/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (11)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Business records
  • Consumer affairs
  • Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
  • Government information and archives
  • Government lending and loan guarantees
  • Military procurement, research, weapons development
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Telephone and wireless communication
  • Unemployment

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2909. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/01/2013)

United States Call Center Worker and Consumer Protection Act of 2013 - Requires a business enterprise that employs 50 or more employees, excluding part-time employees, or 50 or more employees who in the aggregate work at least 1,500 hours per week, exclusive of overtime, in a call center to notify the Secretary of Labor at least 120 days before relocating such center outside of the United States. Subjects violators to a civil penalty of up to $10,000 a day. Directs the Secretary to establish, maintain, and make publicly available a list of all such employers that relocate a call center. Authorizes the Secretary to remove from the list an employer that has relocated the call center from a location outside the United States to a location inside the United States.

Requires such an employer to remain on the list for up to three years after each relocation. Makes such an employer ineligible for federal grants or federal guaranteed loans for five years after being added to the list, except where the employer demonstrates that a lack of such loan or grant would threaten national security, result in substantial job loss in the United States, or harm the environment. Requires the head of federal or state executive agency or military department, when awarding a civilian or defense-related contract, to give preference to a U.S. employer that does not appear on the list.

Requires a business entity that initiates or receives a customer service communication to require each of its employees or agents participating in the communication to disclose their physical location at the beginning of each such communication unless all involved employees or agents are located in the United States. Exempts any communication: (1) initiated by a consumer if the consumer knows or reasonably should know that the employee or agent is located outside the United States, or (2) related to the provision of emergency services. Requires such a business entity, upon request, to transfer a customer to a customer service agent who is physically located in the United States.

Authorizes the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to exclude certain classes or types of business entities or customer services communications from the requirements of this Act under exceptionally compelling circumstances. Sets forth enforcement provisions.