Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 10/29/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/29/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/29/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/29/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 10/29/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/29/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/06/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/16/2014