Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/16/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/23/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew