Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/09/2014