Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/24/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/05/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/11/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/22/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/22/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/11/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/31/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/31/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/31/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 08/01/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 08/01/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 08/01/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 08/01/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/08/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 09/08/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/10/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/15/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/15/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 12/11/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/11/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/11/2014