Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/20/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-62.
12/20/2013 Signed by President.
12/13/2013 Presented to President.
12/10/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8605)
11/12/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 3 (Roll no. 572).(text: CR H6974)
11/12/2013 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-259.
08/01/2013 Introduced in House