Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/05/2014