Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/13/2014