Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/30/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/30/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/30/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/11/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 10/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/11/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/04/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/04/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/04/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/06/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/13/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/13/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/13/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/13/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/13/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/13/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/27/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/01/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/01/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/04/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 04/29/2014