Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/11/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/11/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/11/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 10/16/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/10/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/29/2014