Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/13/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/30/2014