Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/30/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2014