Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/29/2014