Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/30/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/11/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/11/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/04/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 03/04/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/04/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/01/2014