Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/30/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2014