Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/30/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/11/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/11/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/11/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/01/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/04/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/04/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/10/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/10/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/29/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2014