Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/15/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/07/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/07/2014