Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/01/2014