Text: H.R.2942 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (06/02/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 2942

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
June 2, 2014

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs


AN ACT

To amend title 38, United States Code, to reestablish the Professional Certification and Licensure Advisory Committee of the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Reestablishment of Professional Certification and Licensure Advisory Committee.

(a) Reestablishment.—Section 3689(e)(5) of title 38, United States Code, is amended by striking “December 31, 2006” and inserting “December 31, 2019”.

(b) Appointment of new members.—In reestablishing the Professional Certification and Licensure Advisory Committee under subsection (e) of section 3689 of title 38, United States Code, pursuant to subsection (a), the Secretary of Veterans Affairs may appoint new members of the Committee under paragraph (3)(A) of such subsection (e) without regard to the individuals who served as members before the date of the enactment of this Act.

Passed the House of Representatives May 28, 2014.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk.