Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/03/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/03/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/06/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/21/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/19/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 11/19/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/19/2014