There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (10)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Cybersecurity Workforce Assessment Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

CIRDA Act of 2014
Critical Infrastructure Research and Development Advancement Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

CIRDA Act of 2013
Critical Infrastructure Research and Development Advancement Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

CIRDA Act of 2013
Critical Infrastructure Research and Development Advancement Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Cybersecurity Workforce Assessment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to make certain improvements in the laws relating to the advancement of security technologies for critical infrastructure protection, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to require the Secretary of Homeland Security to assess the cybersecurity workforce of the Department of Homeland Security and develop a comprehensive workforce strategy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/18/2014Became Public Law No: 113-246. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014Signed by President.
12/12/2014Presented to President.
12/11/2014Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H9060)
12/10/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
12/10/2014Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6922-6923)
01/09/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-324.
08/01/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
12/18/2014Became Public Law No: 113-246. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014Signed by President.
12/12/2014HousePresented to President.
12/11/2014-10:10amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2014-10:10amHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H9060)
12/11/2014-9:57amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 2952.
12/11/2014-9:57amHouseMr. Meehan moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H9060-9062)
12/10/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2014SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
12/10/2014SenateS.Amdt.4002 Amendment SA 4002 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2014SenateS.Amdt.4001 Amendment SA 4001 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2014SenateS.Amdt.4002 Amendment SA 4002 proposed by Senator Boxer for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S6487; text: CR S6487) To amend the title.
12/10/2014SenateS.Amdt.4001 Amendment SA 4001 proposed by Senator Boxer for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S6486-6487; text: CR S6486-6487) In the nature of a substitute.
12/10/2014SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6486-6487)
12/10/2014SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/29/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/28/2014-5:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2014-5:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6922-6923)
07/28/2014-5:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2952.
07/28/2014-5:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6922-6925)
07/28/2014-5:17pmHouseMr. Meehan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/09/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
01/09/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-324.
10/29/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/29/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/18/2013HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies
09/18/2013HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies
08/09/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/01/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
08/01/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/18/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security08/01/2013 Referred to
10/29/2013 Markup by
01/09/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-324
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies08/09/2013 Referred to
09/18/2013 Markup by
09/18/2013 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/29/2014 Referred to
12/10/2014 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2952.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2952. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-246 (12/18/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 10, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Cybersecurity Workforce Assessment Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security, within 180 days and annually thereafter for three years, to conduct an assessment of the cybersecurity workforce of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), which shall include information on:

  • the readiness and capacity of such workforce to meet its cybersecurity mission;
  • where cybersecurity workforce positions are located within DHS;
  • which such positions are performed by permanent full-time equivalent DHS employees, by independent contractors, and by individuals employed by other federal agencies;
  • which such positions are vacant;
  • the percentage of individuals within each Cybersecurity Category and Specialty Area who received essential training to perform their jobs; and
  • in cases in which such training was not received, what challenges were encountered regarding the provision of such training.

Directs the Secretary to develop, maintain, and update a comprehensive workforce strategy to enhance the readiness, capacity, training, recruitment, and retention of DHS's cybersecurity workforce, which shall include a description of:

  • a multi-phased recruitment plan,
  • a 5-year implementation plan,
  • a 10-year projection of the cybersecurity workforce needs of DHS,
  • any obstacle impeding the hiring and development of such workforce, and
  • any gap in the existing DHS cybersecurity workforce and a plan to fill such gap.

Requires the Secretary to submit to the appropriate congressional committees: (1) annual updates on such assessment and on the Secretary's progress in carrying out such strategy; and (2) a report on the feasibility, cost, and benefits of establishing a Cybersecurity Fellowship Program to offer a tuition payment plan for individuals pursuing undergraduate and doctoral degrees who agree to work for DHS for an agreed-upon period.