Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/23/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/29/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/13/2014