Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/29/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/13/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/08/2014