Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/19/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/28/2014