Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/14/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/09/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/28/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/24/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/30/2014