Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/12/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/26/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/10/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/31/2014