Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/19/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/26/2014