Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/27/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/01/2014