Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2014