Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/19/2014