Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/14/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/19/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/19/2014