Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/18/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/16/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/16/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/16/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/16/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/16/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/16/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/05/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/14/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/27/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/27/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/01/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/10/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/02/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/19/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/21/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/21/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/12/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/12/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/19/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/19/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/19/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/24/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/26/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/26/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/26/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/10/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/25/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/31/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/18/2014