Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2013