Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/16/2014