Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/28/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/08/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/11/2013