Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/28/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/28/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/13/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/10/2014