Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/03/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2014