Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/10/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/10/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/10/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/09/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/05/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/27/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/30/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/21/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/09/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/03/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/29/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/31/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/01/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/09/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/09/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/14/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/14/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/14/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/14/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 11/14/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/19/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/19/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/19/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/19/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/03/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/03/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/03/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/03/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/03/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/03/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/03/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/03/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/03/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/08/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 12/08/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/08/2014