Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/24/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/30/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/31/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 11/14/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/03/2014