Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/09/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/03/2014