Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/14/2014