Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/2014