Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/09/2014