Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/27/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/23/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/29/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/03/2014